TX SB1847 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the correction of an ad valorem tax appraisal roll and related appraisal records.
Title
Relating to the correction of an ad valorem tax appraisal roll and related appraisal records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts