TX SB1843 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to investigations of certain offenses involving the Internet-based sexual exploitation of a minor; creating the Internet crimes against children account to support those activities.
Title
Relating to investigations of certain offenses involving the Internet-based sexual exploitation of a minor; creating the Internet crimes against children account to support those activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Postponed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-05-16 | Read first time | |
2011-05-12 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Passed | |
2011-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-12 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-12 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-05-10 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-10 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-11 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-07 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-06 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-04 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-24 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-03-24 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ALICIA'S LAW
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
PORNOGRAPHY
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
INTERNET
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
PORNOGRAPHY