TX SB1822 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-24 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-24 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Summary
Relating to erecting an off-premise sign adjacent to and visible from certain roads, including Farm-to-Market Road 1431 between the eastern city limits of the city of Marble Falls and the boundary line between Burnet and Travis Counties and roads that follow the route of El Camino Real de Tierra Adentro.
Title
Relating to erecting an off-premise sign adjacent to and visible from certain roads, including Farm-to-Market Road 1431 between the eastern city limits of the city of Marble Falls and the boundary line between Burnet and Travis Counties and roads that follow the route of El Camino Real de Tierra Adentro.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-24 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-19 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time | |
2009-05-18 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-18 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-18 | Record vote | |
2009-05-18 | Passed | |
2009-05-18 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-18 | Record vote | |
2009-05-18 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-18 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-18 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-18 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-18 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |