TX SB1799 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the period of time allowed for issuance of decisions by the commissioner of education in certain appeals against school districts.
Title
Relating to the period of time allowed for issuance of decisions by the commissioner of education in certain appeals against school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-09 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts