TX SB1799 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to the adoption of rules by the supreme court relating to the nonrenewal of the license of an attorney who defaults on a student loan administered by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board.
Title
Relating to the adoption of rules by the supreme court relating to the nonrenewal of the license of an attorney who defaults on a student loan administered by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-08 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Lawyers
SUPREME COURT
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Lawyers
SUPREME COURT