TX SB1794 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the elimination of a specific requirement that certain school districts develop and implement a plan to increase enrollment of the district's students at institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the elimination of a specific requirement that certain school districts develop and implement a plan to increase enrollment of the district's students at institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-09SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenatePassed
2017-05-09SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-09SenateRecord vote
2017-05-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Education
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-09SenateFiled
2017-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback