TX SB1767 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to hearings and protests before appraisal review boards involving ad valorem tax determinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to hearings and protests before appraisal review boards involving ad valorem tax determinations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 1/1/18
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-04HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-05-04HouseRead first time
2017-04-13HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-12SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-12SenateRecord vote
2017-04-12SenatePassed
2017-04-12SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-12SenateRecord vote
2017-04-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-12SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-06SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-05SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-04SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23SenateReferred to Finance
2017-03-23SenateRead first time
2017-03-09SenateFiled
2017-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback