TX SB1735 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of certain obsolete laws governing state pensions and other similar benefits.
Title
Relating to the repeal of certain obsolete laws governing state pensions and other similar benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-12 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Pensions |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Human Services--General
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Human Services--General
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General