TX SB1731 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of laws governing certain state entities, including the functions of those entities, and to certain duties, responsibilities, and functions of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality on the abolishment of certain of those entities.
Title
Relating to the repeal of laws governing certain state entities, including the functions of those entities, and to certain duties, responsibilities, and functions of the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality on the abolishment of certain of those entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2045 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - Rules suspended RV#2043 (Y: 101 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Amended RV#1735 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2045 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - Rules suspended RV#2043 (Y: 101 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Amended RV#1735 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | See remarks for effective date | |
2017-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Point of order withdrawn |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Point of order |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2017-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds |
2017-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-28 | House | 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules |
2017-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-27 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-24 | House | Amended |
2017-05-24 | House | Amended |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-16 | House | No action taken in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Agriculture
AWARDS, MEDALS, PRIZES
BIOENERGY POLICY COUNCIL
BIOENERGY RESEARCH COMMITTEE
BORDER SECURITY COUNCIL
DISTINGUISHED SERVICE AWARDS COMMITTEE, TEXAS
EMISSIONS REDUCTION PLAN ADVISORY BOARD, TEXAS
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
HEALTH PROFESSIONS COUNCIL
PATIENT PROTECTION, OFFICE OF
SCHOOL BUSES & SCHOOL BUS DRIVERS
SECRETARY OF STATE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXPERIMENT STATION
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
AWARDS, MEDALS, PRIZES
BIOENERGY POLICY COUNCIL
BIOENERGY RESEARCH COMMITTEE
BORDER SECURITY COUNCIL
DISTINGUISHED SERVICE AWARDS COMMITTEE, TEXAS
EMISSIONS REDUCTION PLAN ADVISORY BOARD, TEXAS
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
HEALTH PROFESSIONS COUNCIL
PATIENT PROTECTION, OFFICE OF
SCHOOL BUSES & SCHOOL BUS DRIVERS
SECRETARY OF STATE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXPERIMENT STATION
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General