TX SB1728 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Returned to Calendars Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Returned to Calendars Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the equalization for road use by and public charging infrastructure for alternatively fueled vehicles; authorizing a fee and a surcharge.
Title
Relating to the equalization for road use by and public charging infrastructure for alternatively fueled vehicles; authorizing a fee and a surcharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | House | Returned to Calendars Committee |
2021-05-24 | House | Point of order sustained Rule 4, Section 40, and Rule 11, Section 2 |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION, TEXAS STATE
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, TEXAS DIVISION OF
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
HYBRID VEHICLES
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MOTOR VEHICLE BOARD
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
STATE ENERGY CONSERVATION OFFICE
TRANSPORTATION ELECTRIFICATION COUNCIL, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, TEXAS DIVISION OF
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
HYBRID VEHICLES
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MOTOR VEHICLE BOARD
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
STATE ENERGY CONSERVATION OFFICE
TRANSPORTATION ELECTRIFICATION COUNCIL, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration