TX SB1725 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of sexual assault.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of sexual assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB302 (Same As) 2021-05-14 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1725 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01725I.htm |