TX HB302 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of sexual assault.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#809 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#809
2021-05-06HousePassed
2021-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1725 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback