TX SB1717 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-29 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-29 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation and administration of the judicial branch of state government.
Title
Relating to the operation and administration of the judicial branch of state government.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Duncan [R] | Rep. Jim Jackson [R] | Rep. Tryon Lewis [R] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-28 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2011-05-26 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-26 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2011-05-26 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2011-05-26 | Read | |
2011-05-26 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment as amended withdrawn | |
2011-05-23 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-05-23 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-23 | Postponed | |
2011-05-23 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment fails of adoption | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-23 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-18 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-05 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-04 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Amended | |
2011-04-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-26 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--Appellate
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--General
Courts--Municipal
PERMANENT JUDICIAL COMMISSION FOR CHILDREN, YOUTH AND FAMILIES
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
SUPREME COURT
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--Appellate
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--General
Courts--Municipal
PERMANENT JUDICIAL COMMISSION FOR CHILDREN, YOUTH AND FAMILIES
STATE BAR OF TEXAS
SUPREME COURT