TX SB17 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 97-34)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 97-34)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to maternal health and safety, pregnancy-related deaths, and maternal morbidity, including postpartum depression.
Title
Relating to maternal health and safety, pregnancy-related deaths, and maternal morbidity, including postpartum depression.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-15 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#163 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Motion to suspend three day rule fails (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#163 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Motion to suspend three day rule fails (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-24 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-16 | Effective immediately | |
2017-08-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-08-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-08-15 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Read |
2017-08-15 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-08-14 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-08-14 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-14 | House | Passed |
2017-08-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-08-13 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-08-13 | House | Amended |
2017-08-13 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-08-13 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-08-13 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-08-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-08-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-08-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-08-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-08-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-08-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-08-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-08-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-08-12 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-08-11 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-08-11 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-07-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-07-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-25 | Senate | Passed |
2017-07-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-07-25 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-07-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Motion to suspend three day rule fails |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amended |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amended |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-07-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-07-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-07-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-07-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Point of order overruled |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Point of order |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Filed |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MATERNAL MORTALITY & MORBIDITY TASK FORCE
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Women
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MATERNAL MORTALITY & MORBIDITY TASK FORCE
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Women