TX SB17 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a person who is licensed to carry a handgun to openly carry a holstered handgun; creating a criminal offense; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the authority of a person who is licensed to carry a handgun to openly carry a holstered handgun; creating a criminal offense; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Point of order sustained |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Point of order |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |