TX SB1693 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-28 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to periodic rate adjustments by electric utilities.
Title
Relating to periodic rate adjustments by electric utilities.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-28 | Effective immediately | |
2011-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-17 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-17 | Read | |
2011-05-17 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-10 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-10 | Record vote | |
2011-05-10 | Passed | |
2011-05-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-09 | Record vote | |
2011-05-09 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-09 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-09 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | |
2011-05-09 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-09 | Amended | |
2011-05-09 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-09 | Record vote | |
2011-05-09 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-09 | Amended | |
2011-05-09 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-09 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-07 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Amended | |
2011-04-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |