TX SB1680 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the approval of certain private or independent institutions of higher education to participate in the tuition equalization grant program.
Title
Relating to the approval of certain private or independent institutions of higher education to participate in the tuition equalization grant program.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-19 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1508 |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1507 |
2019-05-17 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-04-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS