TX SB1679 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eligibility of certain children for free prekindergarten programs in public schools.
Title
Relating to eligibility of certain children for free prekindergarten programs in public schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. John Turner [D] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] |
Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Victoria Neave Criado [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1477 (Y: 97 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1477 |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2030 (Similar To) 2019-04-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
PRESCHOOL & PREKINDERGARTEN
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
PRESCHOOL & PREKINDERGARTEN