TX SB1660 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the minutes of operation required for public school districts, charter schools, and other education programs and to calculating the average daily attendance for certain education programs.
Title
Relating to the minutes of operation required for public school districts, charter schools, and other education programs and to calculating the average daily attendance for certain education programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Taylor [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1637 (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1592 (Y: 91 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1591 (Y: 96 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1592 (Y: 91 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1591 (Y: 96 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-05-22 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) |
2017-05-22 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
DROPOUTS & AT-RISK STUDENTS
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools