TX SB1647 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-14 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-14 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas Economic Development Act.
Title
Relating to the Texas Economic Development Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Economic Development |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Taxation--School District
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
Taxation--School District