TX SB1645 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority to create and operate a defense adjustment management authority.
Title
Relating to the authority to create and operate a defense adjustment management authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-27 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-27 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |