TX SB164 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - Co-author authorized
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - Co-author authorized
Summary
Relating to a criminal justice policy impact statement attached to certain bills or resolutions.
Title
Relating to a criminal justice policy impact statement attached to certain bills or resolutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-06 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Administration | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed | |
2008-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB789 (Same As) 2009-03-30 - Left pending in subcommittee
HB930 (Same As) 2009-03-23 - Left pending in subcommittee
HB930 (Same As) 2009-03-23 - Left pending in subcommittee
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS BOARD OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Legislature
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS BOARD OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Legislature