TX SB1637 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Summary
Relating to the election and terms of office of directors of the Guadalupe County Groundwater Conservation District.
Title
Relating to the election and terms of office of directors of the Guadalupe County Groundwater Conservation District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-02 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1947 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Elections
Elections--General
GUADALUPE COUNTY GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
TERM LIMITS
Elections--General
GUADALUPE COUNTY GROUNDWATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Groundwater Conserve Dist.
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
TERM LIMITS