TX SB1588 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and re-creation of funds and accounts, the dedication and rededication of revenue, and the exemption of unappropriated money from use for general governmental purposes.
Title
Relating to the creation and re-creation of funds and accounts, the dedication and rededication of revenue, and the exemption of unappropriated money from use for general governmental purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Ogden [R] | Rep. Jim Pitts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | See remarks for effective date | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-27 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2011-05-26 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-26 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2011-05-26 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2011-05-26 | Read | |
2011-05-26 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-25 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-19 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-11 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-05-11 | Read first time | |
2011-05-11 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-11 | Record vote | |
2011-05-11 | Passed | |
2011-05-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-11 | Record vote | |
2011-05-11 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-11 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-11 | Record vote | |
2011-05-11 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-11 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-11 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-11 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-11 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Amended | |
2011-05-11 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-11 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Amended | |
2011-05-11 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-11 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control