TX SB1580 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of securitization by electric cooperatives to address certain weather-related extraordinary costs and expenses and to the duty of electric utility market participants to pay certain amounts owed.
Title
Relating to the use of securitization by electric cooperatives to address certain weather-related extraordinary costs and expenses and to the duty of electric utility market participants to pay certain amounts owed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1425 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1425 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | House | Record vote RV#1425 |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed |
2021-05-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended 1-Paddie |
2021-05-24 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-24 | House | Postponed 5/24/21 6:00 PM |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-24 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3544 (Similar To) 2021-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3544 (Similar To) 2021-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3544 (Similar To) 2021-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
BONDS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Financial
Financial--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
SECRETARY OF STATE
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Financial
Financial--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
SECRETARY OF STATE
Utilities
Utilities--Electric