TX SB1578 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the addition of a county to a freight rail district.
Title
Relating to the addition of a county to a freight rail district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-21 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Passed | |
2011-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-20 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-09 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-07 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-03 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-03 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-14 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-14 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-14 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-04 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed | |
2011-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Railroads
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Railroads