TX SB1567 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the threshold amount at which public utilities are required to report a transaction.
Title
Relating to the threshold amount at which public utilities are required to report a transaction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed | |
2011-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=SB1567 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/SB01567I.htm |