TX SB156 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the transfer of certain probate proceedings to the county in which the executor or administrator of a decedent's estate resides and to the jurisdiction of the transferee court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the transfer of certain probate proceedings to the county in which the executor or administrator of a decedent's estate resides and to the jurisdiction of the transferee court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-05HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-05HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-24HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-23SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-23SenateRecord vote
2021-03-23SenatePassed
2021-03-23SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-23SenateRecord vote
2021-03-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-03-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-03-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-10SenateFiled
2020-11-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2427 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB156
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00156I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00156S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00156E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00156H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00156I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00156I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00156E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00156H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00156H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-23-F.PDF#page=6

Bill Comments 750

feedback