TX SB1554 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to energy savings performance contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to energy savings performance contracts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3583 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback