TX SB1543 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of an independent school district to invest in corporate bonds.
Title
Relating to the authority of an independent school district to invest in corporate bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-31 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-30 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-28 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2011-05-26 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-25 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2011-05-25 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2011-05-25 | Read | |
2011-05-25 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-24 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-23 | Postponed | |
2011-05-23 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-20 | Postponed | |
2011-05-20 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-19 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2011-05-19 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-16 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-11 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-06 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-06 | Record vote | |
2011-05-06 | Passed | |
2011-05-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-06 | Record vote | |
2011-05-06 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-06 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-06 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-06 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-06 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-14 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-12 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Education | |
2011-03-23 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed | |
2011-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BONDS
Corporations & Associations
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts
Corporations & Associations
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts