TX SB1530 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of mediation requirements for balance billing to certain health benefit plans.
Title
Relating to the applicability of mediation requirements for balance billing to certain health benefit plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Corrected comm. report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3299 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Health Care Providers
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION