TX SB1505 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the application of certain taxes imposed on certain tobacco products and to the allocation of certain revenue from those taxes to increase funding for certain health care education programs.
Title
Relating to the application of certain taxes imposed on certain tobacco products and to the allocation of certain revenue from those taxes to increase funding for certain health care education programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
LOANS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Taxation
Taxation--Cigarette
Tobacco Products
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
LOANS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Taxation
Taxation--Cigarette
Tobacco Products