TX SB1501 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of motor vehicle towing, booting, and storage and to the elimination of required state licensing for vehicle booting companies and operators; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of motor vehicle towing, booting, and storage and to the elimination of required state licensing for vehicle booting companies and operators; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1415 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - RV#1374 RV#1375 (Y: 106 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - RV#1374 (Y: 119 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - 3-Goldman RV#1373 (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - 1-Kuempel RV#1372 (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 See remarks for effective date
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HousePassed
2017-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseAmended
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseAmended
2017-05-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseAmended
2017-05-19HouseAmended
2017-05-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseAmended
2017-05-19HouseAmended
2017-05-19HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-18HousePostponed
2017-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-18HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-25SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-25SenateRecord vote
2017-04-25SenatePassed
2017-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-25SenateRecord vote
2017-04-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-20SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-20SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateFiled
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1501
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01501I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01501S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01501E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01501H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01501F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-25-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1501&RcdVtNo=1372&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1501&RcdVtNo=1373&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1501&RcdVtNo=1374&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1501&RcdVtNo=1375&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1501&RcdVtNo=1415&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=296

Bill Comments

feedback