TX SB1499 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of for-profit legal service contract companies.
Title
Relating to the regulation of for-profit legal service contract companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Consumer Protection
Insurance
Insurance--General
Lawyers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Consumer Protection
Insurance
Insurance--General
Lawyers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions