TX SB1498 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-13 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-13 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the collection, remittance, and administration of the tax on gross rental receipts on motor vehicles rented through a marketplace rental provider; imposing a penalty.
Title
Relating to the collection, remittance, and administration of the tax on gross rental receipts on motor vehicles rented through a marketplace rental provider; imposing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4602 (Same As) 2023-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
HB4602 (Same As) 2023-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
HB4602 (Same As) 2023-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--Finance
Electronic Information Systems
RENTAL CARS
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
City Government--Finance
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
County Government
County Government--Finance
Electronic Information Systems
RENTAL CARS
Taxation
Taxation--Sales