TX SB1490 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain holders of a wine and beer retailer's permit to manufacture and sell wine and engage in certain related activities.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain holders of a wine and beer retailer's permit to manufacture and sell wine and engage in certain related activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4029 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
BEER, BREWERIES, & BREWPUBS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
PERMITS
WINE & WINERIES
BEER, BREWERIES, & BREWPUBS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
PERMITS
WINE & WINERIES
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1490 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01490I.htm |