TX SB1489 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Gulf Coast Waste Disposal Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Gulf Coast Waste Disposal Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-11SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-20SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2017-03-20SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateFiled
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback