TX SB1488 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to nonsubstantive additions to, revisions of, and corrections in enacted codes, to the nonsubstantive codification or disposition of various laws omitted from enacted codes, and to conforming codifications enacted by the 84th Legislature to other Acts of that legislature.
Title
Relating to nonsubstantive additions to, revisions of, and corrections in enacted codes, to the nonsubstantive codification or disposition of various laws omitted from enacted codes, and to conforming codifications enacted by the 84th Legislature to other Acts of that legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1328 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | See remarks for effective date | |
2017-06-01 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-18 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-18 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | House | Passed |
2017-05-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Ordered not printed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |