TX SB1483 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Texas community schools.
Title
Relating to Texas community schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] |
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability