TX SB1467 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to economic development incentives for firearms manufacturers, firearms accessory manufacturers, and ammunition manufacturers.
Title
Relating to economic development incentives for firearms manufacturers, firearms accessory manufacturers, and ammunition manufacturers.
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Estes [R] | Rep. John Otto [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2013-04-15 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |