TX SB1456 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-01 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-01 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Summary
Relating to the time for bringing an action on a consumer debt.
Title
Relating to the time for bringing an action on a consumer debt.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-01 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-27 | Record vote | |
2009-04-27 | Passed | |
2009-04-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-27 | Record vote | |
2009-04-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-27 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-27 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-15 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-06 | Filed | |
2009-03-06 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |