TX SB1454 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-10 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reappraisal for ad valorem taxation purposes of real property on which a building completely destroyed by a casualty is located.
Title
Relating to the reappraisal for ad valorem taxation purposes of real property on which a building completely destroyed by a casualty is located.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3608 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB3608 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB3608 (Same As) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions