TX SB1451 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of money laundering and to the forfeiture of certain contraband.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of money laundering and to the forfeiture of certain contraband.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-17 - House - SB 1451Third Reading House (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-22 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-17 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-17 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2013-05-16 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Amended |
2013-05-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CONTRABAND
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
CRIMINAL ASSET FORFEITURE
Financial
Financial--General
MONEY LAUNDERING
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
CRIMINAL ASSET FORFEITURE
Financial
Financial--General
MONEY LAUNDERING