TX SB1439 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to required written notice to a physician, intern, or resident of an educational institution before directly or indirectly performing or participating in an elective abortion.
Title
Relating to required written notice to a physician, intern, or resident of an educational institution before directly or indirectly performing or participating in an elective abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |