TX SB1438 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the effect of a disaster on the calculation of certain tax rates and the procedure for adoption of a tax rate by a taxing unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the effect of a disaster on the calculation of certain tax rates and the procedure for adoption of a tax rate by a taxing unit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1742 (Y: 127 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#523 (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective immediately
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-30SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-30HouseRecord vote RV#1742
2021-05-30HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-28SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-14SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-14SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-14HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-14HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-05-10HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-10HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-10HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-10SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-10SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-10SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-10SenateRead
2021-05-10SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-03SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#523
2021-04-29HousePassed
2021-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-28HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-04-28HouseAmended 3-Guillen
2021-04-28HouseAmended 2-Murphy
2021-04-28HouseAmended 1-Meyer
2021-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-28HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 3376
2021-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-04-21HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateAmended
2021-04-19SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Bettencourt
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateAmended
2021-04-19SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Finance
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3376 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1438
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01438I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01438S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01438E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01438H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01438F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01438S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01438S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01438H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01438H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01438H23.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01438I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01438I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01438E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01438H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01438F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01438F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-19-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-19-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-19-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1438&RcdVtNo=523&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1438&RcdVtNo=1742&Ch=H&Dt=05/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=120
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F.PDF#page=16

Bill Comments 750

feedback