TX HB3376 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the effect of a disaster on the calculation of certain tax rates and the procedure for adoption of a tax rate by a taxing unit.
Title
Relating to the effect of a disaster on the calculation of certain tax rates and the procedure for adoption of a tax rate by a taxing unit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-04-28 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1438 |
2021-04-21 | House | Postponed 4/28/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1438 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Tax Rate