TX SB1430 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of solid waste disposal services by certain counties.
Title
Relating to the provision of solid waste disposal services by certain counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2023-05-24 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2023-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-22 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2023-05-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-05-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CAMERON COUNTY
COLONIAS
County Government
County Government--General
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
HIDALGO COUNTY
INTERNET
MEXICO
PUBLIC NOTICE
COLONIAS
County Government
County Government--General
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
HIDALGO COUNTY
INTERNET
MEXICO
PUBLIC NOTICE