TX SB1428 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reformation of the sentences of juveniles convicted of capital felonies.
Title
Relating to the reformation of the sentences of juveniles convicted of capital felonies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice