TX SB1425 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disbursements from the universal service fund for certain small and rural companies.
Title
Relating to disbursements from the universal service fund for certain small and rural companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#911 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Effective immediately | |
2023-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-08 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-04 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#911 |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2771 |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-14 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2771 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2771 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2771 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Laid on the table subject to call