TX SB1422 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to coordinated county transportation authorities; creating an offense.
Title
Relating to coordinated county transportation authorities; creating an offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-27 | Read | |
2011-05-27 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Passed | |
2011-05-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-11 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-11 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-11 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-05 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-05 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-05 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed | |
2011-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Highways
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Railroads
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Highways
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Railroads
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road